If 13 x 12 = 651 & 41 x 23 = 448, then, 24 x 22 =?

If 13 x 12 = 651 & 41 x 23 = 448, then, 24 x 22 =?

Looking for a Similar Assignment? Order a custom answers with us

Order Over WhatsApp